MD SB163 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting an individual from committing a certain drunk or drugged driving offense if the individual has been convicted previously for certain other crimes under certain circumstances; making a violation of the Act a felony; establishing a penalty of imprisonment not exceeding 10 years or a fine not exceeding $10,000 or both; establishing that the District Court and circuit courts have concurrent jurisdiction over certain drunk and drugged driving offenses; and making certain conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2019)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-25HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-02-22SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-02-20SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-20SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-15SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/06 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-21SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback