MD SB164 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the caps on the percentages of certain costs for the construction, acquisition, renovation, and equipping of community mental health facilities, addiction facilities, and developmental disabilities facilities for which State grants can be provided under the Community Mental Health, Addiction, and Developmental Disabilities Capital Program; increasing the caps on the percentages of certain costs for certain projects that may be covered by State grants under the Federally Qualified Health Centers Grant Program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Department of Health - Capital and Grant Programs - State Grants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 386
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-16HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {879632/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-01-29SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
2019-01-21SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback