MD SB165 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (106-29)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Safe Schools Maryland Program in the Maryland Center for School Safety to establish procedures for anonymous reporting of behaviors, involving one or more students, that are of concern, dangerous, violent, or unlawful, or the threat of these activities; requiring the School Safety Subcabinet to develop program guidance for local school systems or schools by September 1, 2019; authorizing, if there are reasonable grounds to believe an individual is a threat to public safety, certain documents be provided to certain persons; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safe Schools Maryland Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (106-29) (Y: 106 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (106-29)
2019-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08HouseFloor Committee Amendment {125165/1 Adopted
2019-04-08HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
2019-04-03HouseSpecial Order until 04/04 (Delegate Love) Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {665967/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-15HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {294735/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {294735/1
2019-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0165&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0165f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0165t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0165_29473501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0165_66596701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0165_12516501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0005/sb0165.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0165_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0495.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0165_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1560.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback