MD SB167 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Third Reading Passed (132-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Third Reading Passed (132-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Social Work Examiners to issue a temporary license to practice social work to certain applicants who meet certain requirements; providing that a temporary license authorizes the holder to practice social work only under the supervision of a Board-approved supervisor while the license is effective; providing that a temporary license is valid until the earlier of notification of permanent licensure or 1 year after the date on which the temporary license was issued; etc.
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners – Temporary License to Practice Social Work
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-2) |
2021-04-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {736882/1 Adopted |
2021-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {924032/1 Adopted |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-31 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Examinations
Health Occupations
Licenses
Managers and Supervisors
Notices
Social Workers
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Examinations
Health Occupations
Licenses
Managers and Supervisors
Notices
Social Workers
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 19 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 309.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |