MD SB170 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 125
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 125
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that a ground lease holder may not bring any suit, action, or proceeding against the current leasehold tenant or a former leasehold tenant to recover the ground rent that was due and owing before the date the current leasehold tenant acquired title to the leasehold interest if the ground lease was not registered in accordance with certain law prior to the date the current leasehold tenant acquired title, notwithstanding any other provision of law.
Title
Real Property - Ground Leases - Past Due Ground Rent
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 125 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB241 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 124
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 8 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |