MD SB175 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 57
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 57
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that the council of unit owners' property insurance deductible is a common expense if the cause of any damage to the condominium originates from an event outside the condominium units and common elements; increasing, from $5,000 to $10,000, the maximum amount of the council of unit owners' property insurance deductible for which a unit owner is responsible; applying the Act to all policies of property and casualty insurance issued, delivered, or renewed in the State to a condominium council of unit owners; etc.
Title
Condominiums - Responsibility for Property Insurance Deductibles
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 57 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Beidle) Adopted |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Favorable |
Same As/Similar To
HB108 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 56
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 11 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |