MD SB176 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy to report certain information for the preceding calendar year for cases involving a crime of violence disaggregated by judicial circuit to the Governor, the House Judiciary Committee and the Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee by December 1, 2019, and each December 1 thereafter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy - Annual Report - Crimes of Violence

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {388678/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-23SenateHearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback