MD SB177 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to provide for the renovation of the Ocean City Convention facility; increasing, from $17,340,000 to $24,500,000, the amount the Board of Public Works may approve for the issuance of certain bonds related to the Ocean City Convention facility without receiving authorization by the General Assembly; altering certain contribution amounts, allocations of savings, and leasehold ownership allocations that must be contained in a certain lease or other written agreement with Ocean City; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Carozza) Adopted (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 218
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2019-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-04-06HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-04-05HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-04-05SenateMotion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Carozza) Adopted
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback