MD SB178 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that regulations adopted under certain provisions of law regulating behavioral health programs include provisions authorizing a behavioral health program licensed as an outpatient mental health center to satisfy any regulatory requirement that a medical director be onsite through the use of telehealth by the director.
Title
Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors – Telehealth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Floor Amendment {613124/1 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Special Order until 04/02 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-26 | House | Special Order until 03/27 (Delegate Glenn) Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {376986/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-01 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {557676/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Licenses
Mental and Behavioral Health
Patients
Public Health
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Committees and Commissions
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Licenses
Mental and Behavioral Health
Patients
Public Health
Telecommunications and Information Technology