MD SB179 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to adopt and maintain a written plan document for the optional retirement program; and authorizing the Board of Trustees to adopt certain regulations.
Title
Optional Retirement Program - Regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 9:00 a.m. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Notices
Public Employees
Publications
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
State Documents
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Committees and Commissions
Notices
Public Employees
Publications
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
State Documents
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement