MD SB179 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB190
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a person may not be denied the right to purchase, possess, or carry a firearm solely on the basis that the person is authorized to use medical cannabis.
Title
Firearms - Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry - Use of Medical Cannabis
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Floor Amendment {843424/1 (Senator Lam) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Lam) Adopted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Favorable |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB179 (Carry Over) 2020-02-17 - Referred Judiciary
HB1582 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-12 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1582 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-12 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 5 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |