MD SB180 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the eligibility requirements for the Robotics Grant Program to include certain eligible organizations to support existing robotics programs and increase the number of robotics programs in the State; defining "eligible organization" as a nonprofit organization providing youth with an out-of-school experience focusing on personal and workforce development; requiring the Governor to appropriate at least $350,000 for the Program; requiring, where practical, the award of grants to ensure geographic diversity; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Robotics Grant Program - Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 428
2019-04-02SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-02SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
2019-03-28HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments {445362/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-08HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {394432/2 Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-24SenateHearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0180&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0180f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0180t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0180e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_428_sb0180e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0180_39443202.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0180_44536201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb0180.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0180_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0414.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0180_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0940.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback