MD SB181 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-09 - Re-referred Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-09 - Re-referred Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing collective bargaining rights for specified independent home care providers; providing that there may be only one appropriate bargaining unit for the providers; authorizing providers to designate an exclusive representative; requiring that procedures be governed by specified provisions of law; providing for the scope of collective bargaining; requiring an exclusive representative to provide specified notice; providing that specified providers are not required to pay a service fee, but are required to make a specified payment; etc.
Title
Collective Bargaining - Independent Home Care Providers
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {913729/1 Rejected (Y: 11 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Shank) {313622/1 Rejected (Y: 11 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Shank) {613522/1 Rejected (Y: 14 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Brinkley) {843626/1 Rejected (Y: 13 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Brinkley) {933129/1 Rejected (Y: 14 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Getty) {483021/1 Adopted (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-03 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {913729/1 Rejected (Y: 11 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Shank) {313622/1 Rejected (Y: 11 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Shank) {613522/1 Rejected (Y: 14 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Brinkley) {843626/1 Rejected (Y: 13 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Brinkley) {933129/1 Rejected (Y: 14 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-03 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Getty) {483021/1 Adopted (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-09 | Re-referred Appropriations | |
2011-04-04 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (31-16) | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) Rejected (11-34) | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Amendment (Senator Shank) Rejected (11-34) | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Amendment (Senator Shank) Rejected (14-32) | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) Rejected (13-31) | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) Rejected (14-32) | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Amendment (Senator Getty) Adopted (27-19) | |
2011-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-02 | Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-24 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Aging, Department of
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Elections
Fees
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Hearings
Home Care Services
Human Resources, Department of
Notices
Reports
Strikes
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Elections
Fees
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Hearings
Home Care Services
Human Resources, Department of
Notices
Reports
Strikes
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment