MD SB181 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Public Financing of Judicial Elections; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and develop a proposal regarding the public financing of judicial elections in the State; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and proposal to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2012; terminating the Act at the end of June 30, 2013; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study the Public Financing of Judicial Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-20 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Elections
Judges
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Courts
Elections
Judges
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0181.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0181f.pdf |