MD SB181 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission to approve certain patient applications for patients who have an opioid use disorder.
Title
Medical Cannabis - Provider Applications - Opioid Use Disorder
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Cannabis
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Health
Patients
Public Health
Substance Abuse
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Health
Patients
Public Health
Substance Abuse