MD SB184 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Board of Elections, in consultation with the Department of Information Technology, to make publicly available on the Internet each meeting agenda, made available at least 24 hours in advance of each meeting, live video streaming, and unedited archived video recordings of open meetings; requiring the State Board to prepare written minutes after each meeting; requiring the Department to provide the staff to the State Board necessary to stream live video of the open meetings of the State Board; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486
2019-03-26SenateReturned Passed
2019-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2019-03-22HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-22HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-21HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-27HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-02-26SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-02-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-22SenateFloor Amendment {703121/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2019-02-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {154135/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-24SenateHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-24SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-24SenateHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0184&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0184f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0184t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_486_sb0184t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0184_15413501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0184_70312101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/sb0184.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0184_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0298.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0184_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0907.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback