MD SB184 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the application of the Maryland Transit Administration's reduced fare program for opioid treatment program patients by prohibiting participation by a treatment program that was subject to a license suspension or revocation, approval of a settlement agreement establishing specific conditions for continued program operations, or an approved petition for receivership within the previous 10 years.
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Program Patients – Program Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {507071/1 Adopted |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-10-24 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Contracts
Licenses
Mass Transit
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Opioids
Patients
Petitions
Prices
Substance Abuse
Transportation - Generally
Contracts
Licenses
Mass Transit
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Opioids
Patients
Petitions
Prices
Substance Abuse
Transportation - Generally
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 7 | 712 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |