MD SB189 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 244
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 244
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, on review and approval of the Secretary of Agriculture or the Secretary's designee, the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners to issue a cease and desist order against a person who practices, attempts to practice, or offers to practice veterinary medicine in violation of certain laws or takes certain actions; specifying that a civil penalty imposed under the Act may not exceed $5,000 for a first offense or $10,000 for a second or subsequent offense; etc.
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners – Cease and Desist Orders and Civil Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 244 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {174236/1 Adopted |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB545 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 243
Subjects
Agriculture
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Fines
Fraud
Health
Hearings
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Veterinarians
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Fines
Fraud
Health
Hearings
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Veterinarians
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 2 | 313.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |