MD SB193 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-21 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-21 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a custodian to deny inspection of records of investigations conducted by or investigatory files compiled by an inspector general whose office is created by State law or the laws of a political subdivision of the State.
Title
Public Information Act - Denial of Part of a Public Record - Investigations by Inspectors General
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB380 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-22 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Boundaries
Disclosure
Investigations and Inquiries
Privacy
Public Information
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Disclosure
Investigations and Inquiries
Privacy
Public Information
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 4 | 351 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |