MD SB198 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-06 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (120-15)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-06 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (120-15)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to $20 from $10 specified appearance of counsel fees collected or charged by the Clerk of the Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County.
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 120 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (120-15) | |
2012-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments 732411/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2012-03-16 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-23 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2012-02-22 | Third Reading Passed (46-1) | |
2012-02-20 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-01-24 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-20 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Attorneys
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Court Costs
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Fees
Attorneys
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Court Costs
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Fees