MD SB20 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB303
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the fourth Thursday in March as Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and cultural organizations to observe Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day through appropriate and informative programs and activities.
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Floor Amendment {153223/1 (Senator Carozza) Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB20 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Health and Government Operations
HB716 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
HB716 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Armed Forces
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Education
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Education
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 7 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 412 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 413 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 414 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 415 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 417 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |