MD SB200 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from sponsoring, conducting, or participating in organized contests that have the objective of killing a coyote, fox, or raccoon for prizes or monetary awards except under certain circumstances; and establishing a fine of $100 for each coyote, fox, or raccoon killed in violation of the Act.
Title
Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2021-04-12 | House | Conference Committee Report {203420/1 Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-4) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Conference Committee Report {203420/1 Adopted |
2021-04-09 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Gilchrist, Stein and Jacobs) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | House Refuses Recede |
2021-04-09 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Gilchrist, Stein and Jacobs) |
2021-04-09 | House | House Refuses Recede |
2021-04-09 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kagan, Simonaire and Lam) |
2021-04-09 | House | Senate Requests House Recede |
2021-04-09 | House | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Kagan, Simonaire and Lam) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2021-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (114-21) |
2021-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {790313/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-9) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Bailey) Adopted |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {104239/1 Adopted |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-12-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-08-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB293 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 427 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |