MD SB202 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to notify an account holder within 7 days after determining a 200% increase in water usage during the immediately preceding billing period; requiring that the notification required under the Act contain certain information, including information regarding a free inspection under certain circumstances; requiring an account holder to repair a water leak outside or inside the account holder's home within 30 days; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Leakage - Billing MC/PG 113-19

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08SenateHearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
2019-03-08SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-15SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-28SenateHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-24SenateReassigned to Finance
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback