MD SB207 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 109
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 109
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a certain unaccompanied minor in need of shelter to consent to shelter and supportive services under certain circumstances; authorizing an unaccompanied minor who is a parent to consent to shelter and supportive services for the minor's child; requiring a certain service provider to contact a parent, a guardian, or an adult relative of an unaccompanied minor within 72 hours; requiring a service provider to develop procedures to screen staff members who work with minors including a criminal history check; etc.
Title
Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 109 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {714631/1 Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Washington) Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {714631/1 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB206 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 108
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Children
Criminal Background Investigations
Economic and Community Development
Education
Ex-Offenders
Family Law
Fees
Fingerprinting
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Liability
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Social Services
Violence
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Children
Criminal Background Investigations
Economic and Community Development
Education
Ex-Offenders
Family Law
Fees
Fingerprinting
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Liability
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Social Services
Violence
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2708 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |