MD SB210 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing civil immunity from liability for a COVID-19 claim to a person who acts in compliance with certain statutes, rules, regulations, executive orders, and agency orders, unless the person acted with gross negligence or intentional wrongdoing; providing that certain deviations from certain statutes, rules, regulations, executive orders, and agency orders does not deny a person civil immunity provided for under the Act; limiting the effect of the civil immunity provided for under the Act; etc.
Title
COVID-19 Claim - Civil Immunity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-10-16 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB508 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-26 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Civil Actions
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
COVID-19
Executive Orders
Governor
Liability
pandemics
Rules and Regulations
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
COVID-19
Executive Orders
Governor
Liability
pandemics
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 5 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0210?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0210f.pdf |