MD SB212 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, for purposes of an attested will, a person from qualifying as a witness in the presence of the testator if the witness is in a different physical location than the testator; clarifying the conditions under which a will executed outside the State is properly executed; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Title
Wills - Execution of Wills - Witnesses and Wills Executed Outside the State
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-0) (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-0) (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-0) |
2019-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {966484/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {998074/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Electronic Communication
Estates and Trusts
Interstate Affairs
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Witnesses
Estates and Trusts
Interstate Affairs
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Witnesses