MD SB215 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the length of time a school vehicle may be operated in Allegany County and Garrett County from 12 years to 15 years, unless it fails to meet the applicable school bus and motor vehicle safety standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 116
2019-04-01SenateReturned Passed
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed (135-1)
2019-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-02-14SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-02-12SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-12SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-11SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-24SenateHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-24SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback