MD SB216 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 594
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the maximum hotel rental tax rate that Garrett County may impose from 6% to 8%; and altering the distribution of hotel rental tax revenue in Garrett County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-9) (Y: 128 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 594
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (128-9)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-22HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-02-21SenateThird Reading Passed (44-2)
2019-02-19SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-19SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-18SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-24SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback