MD SB218 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Renaming the food stamp program to be the food supplement program; requiring the State to provide matching funds to counties for a supplement for each child in a household that receives federally funded benefits under the food supplement program; providing that the combined State and county supplement shall equal $30 per month in June, July, and August and $10 in December; requiring a county to submit a certain application by December 1 to receive certain funding; specifying the required State and local shares of funding; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-16) (Y: 121 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (121-16)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {489539/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-24SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback