MD SB219 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing licensing requirements for certain money transmission locations; altering certain net worth requirements for certain applicants for a license to engage in money transmission; requiring an applicant for a license to engage in money transmission to provide the address of each self-service financial kiosk in a certain application; specifying a $500 licensing fee that an applicant for a branch location license is required to pay; etc.
Title
Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Funds Transfer
Equipment
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Identification
Licenses
Mobile Devices
Notices
Reports
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Funds Transfer
Equipment
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Identification
Licenses
Mobile Devices
Notices
Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Financial Institutions | 12 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 408.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 412 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 413 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 414 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 415 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 418 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 422 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 425 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 427 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 12 | 430.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |