MD SB22 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the amount of wages of a judgment debtor that are exempt from attachment; making a conforming change; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Caroline County
Civil Actions and Procedures
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Courts
Debt Collection
Kent County
Queen Anne's County
Salaries and Compensation
Worcester County
Civil Actions and Procedures
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Courts
Debt Collection
Kent County
Queen Anne's County
Salaries and Compensation
Worcester County