MD SB221 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System to determine whether the General Assembly should create an independent school board for the Juvenile Services Education System and identify ways to reform and improve juvenile education services; requiring the Department of Juvenile Services and the State Department of Education to staff the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to submit a certain report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 20, 2020; etc.
Title
Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2019-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled (Judiciary) |
2019-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2019-02-27 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {434930/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Juvenile Services, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Sunset
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Juvenile Services, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Sunset