MD SB221 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB881
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement to obtain a handgun qualification license that a certain firearms safety training course include a certain firearms orientation component.
Title
Handgun Qualification License - Firearms Safety Training
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB881 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 5 | 117.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0221?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0221f.pdf |