MD SB224 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 632
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing in Frederick County the requirement that certain real estate owners within 5,000 feet of an establishment for which a license is sought sign a petition of support for the license application; repealing the provision of law providing for selecting other persons to sign the petition under certain circumstances; requiring an applicant for a license post a certain notice at the location described in the application for at least 14 days before the application hearing; and specifying the contents of the notice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages License Applications - Repeal of Petition of Support - Notice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-0) (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 632
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (123-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-11HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-06SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-05SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-24SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback