MD SB225 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring all units in the Executive, Judicial, and Legislative branches of State government, including all units with independent personnel systems, to provide certain reasonable accommodations for an employee with certain limitations caused or contributed to by pregnancy or childbirth; prohibiting units of State government, under certain circumstances, from requiring an employee to take certain leave or requiring an employee to accept certain accommodations under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
State Personnel - Employee Accommodations - Pregnancy and Childbirth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 234 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {977973/1 Adopted |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB523 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 233
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Leave
Pregnancy
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Leave
Pregnancy
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 2 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |