MD SB226 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a party to a certain wrongful detainer or distress action brought in the District Court to demand a trial by jury in accordance with certain provisions of law, subject to certain provisions of law; and making certain provisions of law regarding jury demands applicable to wrongful detainer actions.
Title
Real Property - Wrongful Detainer and Distress Actions - Trial by Jury
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-20 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |