MD SB226 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying a certain prohibition against the erection or maintenance of outdoor signs along or near expressways.
Title
Highways – Prohibition on Outdoor Signs Along Expressways – Modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-6) |
2020-03-18 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-1) |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {147277/1 Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Boundaries
Highways
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Signs and Billboards
Transportation - Highways
Urban Areas
Zoning and Planning
Highways
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Signs and Billboards
Transportation - Highways
Urban Areas
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 8 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 8 | 741 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 8 | 744 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |