MD SB230 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring local boards of elections to prepare and release a report of the unofficial results of the absentee ballot vote tabulation at the end of each day of absentee ballot canvassing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Canvassing of Absentee Ballots - Reporting Unofficial Results

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (137-2)
2019-04-05HouseSpecial Order until 04/06 (Delegate Atterbeary) Adopted
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-27HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-02-26SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-02-22SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-21SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-31SenateHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback