MD SB234 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 602
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a person that is subject to the Forest Conservation Act to demonstrate that appropriate credits generated by a forest mitigation bank in the same county or watershed are not available before the person may pay money to a State or local forest conservation fund to meet certain requirements; prohibiting a local authority from collecting money into its forest conservation fund unless it has submitted to the Department of Natural Resources the mitigation plan and accounting procedures; applying the Act prospectively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-15) (Y: 120 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 602
2019-04-02SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-02SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (120-15)
2019-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {550012/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-19HouseHearing canceled
2019-03-18HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-01HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-02-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-02-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {104638/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-29SenateHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0234&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0234f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0234t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0234e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_602_sb0234e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0234_10463801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0234_55001201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/sb0234.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0234_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0329.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0234_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1009.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0941.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback