MD SB236 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 750
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing from 6 months to 1 year the minimum criminal sentence or potential sentence that disqualifies an individual from jury service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-43) (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-5) (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 750
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (95-43)
2019-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-03-11HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (41-5)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-30SenateHearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-30SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback