MD SB239 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that certain provisions of law apply to managed care organizations; requiring a managed care organization to pay a certain fee in certain calendar years; altering the purpose of provisions of law requiring that certain entities be subject to a certain assessment on certain amounts; requiring that certain entities be subject to certain assessments in certain calendar years; clarifying that certain assessments are for insurance products subject to certain provisions of federal law and may be subject to a State assessment; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization - Provider Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-3) (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-41) (Y: 98 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-8) (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-41) (Y: 98 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-8) (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-3) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (98-41) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {896585/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-27 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-8) |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {857975/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Exemptions
Federal Government
Fees
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health, Department of
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Managed Care Organizations
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Exemptions
Federal Government
Fees
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health, Department of
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Managed Care Organizations
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset