MD SB240 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Defining the term "local promise scholarship" as a community college scholarship program in effect on July 1, 2018, that provides a scholarship to any high school senior who is eligible for enrollment at the community college; and specifying that if an award recipient is eligible for a local promise scholarship, an award under the Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship program shall be credited to the tuition of a scholarship recipient before the award of a local promise scholarship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship Program - Alterations to the Award of Scholarship Funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-0) (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464
2019-03-26SenateReturned Passed
2019-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed (128-0)
2019-03-22HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-22HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-22HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-08HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (45-1)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {334934/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-29SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback