MD SB242 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-06 - Delegates Sydnor, Moon, and Arikan
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-06 - Delegates Sydnor, Moon, and Arikan
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the time period after which a court is required, under certain circumstances, to dismiss a charge of murder in the first degree against a defendant found incompetent to stand trial from 5 years to 10 years.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Dismissal of Charges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-06 | House | Delegates Sydnor, Moon, and Arikan |
2019-04-06 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-06 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senators Lee, Hough, and Waldstreicher |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {342412/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {828573/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Mental and Behavioral Health
Murder
Statutes of Limitation
Trials
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Mental and Behavioral Health
Murder
Statutes of Limitation
Trials