MD SB242 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB548
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Transportation to study and make recommendations on the feasibility of establishing a point-to-point commuter bus route that serves certain population centers along the I-270 corridor in Frederick and Montgomery Counties and provides service to and from job centers in Northern Virginia; requiring the Department, to consult with certain governments, stakeholders, and entities and to study and make recommendations to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB116 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
SB548 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
SB548 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Boundaries
Buses
Communications
Commuters
Frederick County
Highways
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Maps and Charts
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Parking
Reports
Ridesharing
Sunset
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Buses
Communications
Commuters
Frederick County
Highways
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Maps and Charts
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Parking
Reports
Ridesharing
Sunset
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of