MD SB249 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 606
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Governor to include the State as a full participant in any regional governmental initiative, agreement, or compact that limits or reduces greenhouse gas emissions from the transportation sector; requiring, beginning November 1, 2019, and for each of the next 3 years, the Departments of the Environment and Transportation to submit a report on the status of any regional initiative, agreement, or compact that limits or reduces emissions from the transportation sector to the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional Initiative to Limit or Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions in Transportation Sector - Authorization (Regional Transportation and Climate Protection Act of 2019)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (30-14) (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-35) (Y: 100 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 606
2019-04-04SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (30-14)
2019-04-04SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (100-35)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {580112/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
2019-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (33-14)
2019-03-11SenateSpecial Order until 3/12 (Senator West) Adopted
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment {604939/1 Adopted
2019-03-06SenateLaid Over (Senator Lam) Adopted
2019-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {604939/1
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-29SenateHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0249&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0249f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0249t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0249e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_606_sb0249e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0249_60493901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0249_58011201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0249.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0249_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0478.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0249_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1130.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1165.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0249_ecm.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback