MD SB249 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 348
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 348
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a defendant in a malpractice claim against a licensed professional to move for a protective order to limit the disclosure of certain documentary evidence to protect the defendant from annoyance, embarrassment, oppression, or undue burden or expense; requiring a court, on a certain motion by the defendant, to review the claimant's request for documentary evidence and authorizing the court to issue a certain protective order for good cause shown; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Title
Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Cassilly [R] | Sen. Jack Bailey [R] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] | Sen. Jason Gallion [R] |
Sen. Justin Ready [R] | Sen. Johnny Salling [R] | Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 348 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB858 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 347
Subjects
Architects
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
Disclosure
Engineers
Evidence
Interior Designers
Landscape Architects
Privacy
Protection Orders
Surveyors
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
Disclosure
Engineers
Evidence
Interior Designers
Landscape Architects
Privacy
Protection Orders
Surveyors
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 2C-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 2C-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |