MD SB25 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation, the Maryland Historical Trust, the Maryland Environmental Trust, certain other land trusts, a county, and the Department of Natural Resources to record notice of certain easements, covenants, restrictions, and conditions in the land records of the county in which the property interest is located; specifying the information required to be provided in the notice; requiring that the notice be indexed for recording in a certain manner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property - Conservation Easements, Covenants, Restrictions, and Conditions - Recording Notice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 127
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-29HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-29HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-18HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18HouseHearing canceled
2019-03-18HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18HouseHearing canceled
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-01-31SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-01-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-01-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {208874/1 Report Adopted
2019-01-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-09SenateHearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-10-10SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback