MD SB251 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 728
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a minor has the same capacity as an adult to consent to treatment for the prevention of human immunodeficiency virus (HIV).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Treatment for the Prevention of HIV - Consent by Minors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-19) (Y: 112 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 728
2019-03-26SenateReturned Passed
2019-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed (111-19)
2019-03-22HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-22HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-21HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-16HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {917278/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-08SenateLaid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2019-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {917278/1
2019-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-01-28SenateHearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
2019-01-25SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback