MD SB253 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 751
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Excluding from the Major Information Technology Development Project Fund certain money received by Baltimore City Community College; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Major Information Technology Development Project Fund – Money Received by Baltimore City Community College – Exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 751
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2019-04-05HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2019-04-05SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseDelegates Carr, Szeliga, and Rosenberg
2019-04-03HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-03HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2019-04-03SenateSenators Young, Patterson, and Nathan-Pulliam
2019-04-03SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-03SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-03SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-29HouseFloor Amendment {873726/1 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2019-03-29HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-16HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {824537/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-29SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0253&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0253f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0253t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0253e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_751_sb0253e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0253_82453701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0253_87372601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0253_50392701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0253_21302301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0003/sb0253.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0253_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0480.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0253_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1054.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0253_21302301.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1217.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1412.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback