MD SB254 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB303
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to adopt by regulation the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code as the Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards; requiring the Department to adopt each subsequent version of the Standards within 18 months after the version is issued; requiring the Department to take certain actions before adopting each version of the Standards; prohibiting the Department from adopting a modification of the Standards that is more stringent than certain requirements; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards - Adoption
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB254 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
HB109 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-09 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB109 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-09 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Certifications
Codes
Counties
Fees
Hearings
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Open Government
Public Safety
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Swimming Pools
Codes
Counties
Fees
Hearings
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Open Government
Public Safety
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Swimming Pools
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 12 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 12 | 1202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 12 | 1203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 12 | 1204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 12 | 1205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 12 | 1206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 12 | 1207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0254?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0254f.pdf |